How to multiply using a short-cut trick if one of the numbers is 5 or 25 or 125?



Home : Education : Vedic Maths

If you are multiplying two numbers but one of the numbers is either 5 or 25 or 125 then you can use a short-cut trick to make the calculation very easy that can be done within seconds.

Let us first take an example where one of the numbers is 5 in the multiplication.

Whenever you see 5 as one of the numbers in the multiplication then simply divide the other number by 2 and multiply the outcome with 10 to get the quick answer.

Example 1: Suppose you want to multiply 462 * 5

So here, we will divide 462 by 2 and multiply the outcome by 10 as below.

462/2 = 231

231 * 10 = 2310 (this is the quick answer of 462 * 5 which can be done in the mind within seconds).

But multiplying with 5 is otherwise also very easy. But things become difficult when one of the numbers is either 25 or 125. This trick will be very useful for multiplying with these 2 numbers.

However, there will be a change while multiplying with 25 and 125. Let us first take the case of multiplying with 25.

Example 2: Suppose you want to multiply 462 * 25

Whenever you see 25 as one of the numbers in the multiplication then simply divide the other number by 4 and multiply the outcome with 100 to get the quick answer.

So let's do it.

462/4 = 115.50

115.50 * 100 = 11550 (this is your easy and quick answer for 462 * 25).

you will get the same answer when you will do it the usual way or by making use of the calculator.

Let us take one more difficult example.

Example 3: Suppose you want to multiply 1150 * 25

So let us do it.

1150/4 = 287.50

287.50 * 100 = 28750 (this is your easy and quick answer of 1150 * 25).

Now, let us take the case when one of the numbers in the multiplication is 125.

Whenever you see 125 as one of the numbers in the multiplication then simply divide the other number by 8 (up to 3 decimal places) and multiply the outcome with 1000 to get the quick answer.

Example 4: Suppose you want to multiply 550 * 125

550/8 = 68.75

68.75 * 1000 = 68750 (this is your easy and quick answer in seconds).

How to divide 54876 by 5 or 25 or 125 using a shortcut maths trick?

You may also be interested in

How to multiply two 2-digit numbers within seconds using a math trick in mind?

How to find any percentage of any number quickly using a math trick?

Why you don't need to learn tables other than tables of 2 to 10?

Do you find it difficult to learn the tables?

How to multiply 5432 with 3124 in short time using a math trick?

How to multiply 432 with 354 in short time using a math trick?

What is the best short-cut trick to find the square of any number?

How to find the square of 245 and other 3-digit numbers from short trick?

How to multiply 1012 and 1030 using short-cut math trick?

Written by: Rajesh Bihani ( Find me on Google+ )

Disclaimer: The suggestions in the article(wherever applicable) are for informational purposes only. They are not intended as medical or any other type of advice