How to multiply 1012 and 1030 using short-cut math trick for long numbers multiplications?



Home : Education : Vedic Maths

Here is a method to multiply large numbers without using a calculator.

Example 1: Suppose you want to multiply big numbers 1012 and 1030.

Actually, both these numbers are quite close to the round number 1000.

1012 = 1000 + 12 (so 1012 is 12 more than 1000) so we take it as +12 (note 1)

1030 = 1000 + 30 (so 1030 is 30 more than 1000) so we take it as +30 (note 2)

We will call 1000 as the base number here as we are comparing both the numbers with it.

Step 1 is to add note 1 + note 2 + base number which will be as below

12 + 30 + 1000 = 1042

Step 2 is to multiply the outcome of step 1 with the base number 1000.

that is we will multiply 1042 with 1000

1042 * 1000 = 1042000

Step 3 is to multiply note 1 and note 2 and add to the outcome of step 2

12 * 30 = 360 + 1042000 = 1042360 (this is your quick answer).

All the above steps can be remembered in the mind with practice and then the things will become very easy and you don't need to do the actual multiplication which will be very lengthy.

But there are some difficult cases also, so we will take more examples.

Example 2: Suppose you want to multiply big numbers 1014 and 980.

Again both these numbers are quite close to the round number 1000. So we will take 1000 as the base number.

1014 = 1000 + 14 (so 1014 is 14 more than 1000) so we take it as +14 (note 1)

980 = 1000 - 20 (so 980 is 20 less than 1000) so we take it as -20 (note 2)

The base number is again 1000 as we are comparing both the numbers with it.

Step 1 is to add note 1 + note 2 + base number which will be as below

14 + (-20) + 1000 = 994

Step 2 is to multiply the outcome of step 1 with the base number 1000.

that is we will multiply 994 with 1000

994 * 1000 = 994000

Step 3 is to multiply note 1 and note 2 and add to the outcome of step 2

14 * (-20) = -280 + 994000 = 993720 (this is your quick answer).

Example 3: Suppose you want to multiply big numbers 945 and 936.

Both these numbers are quite close to the round number 900. So here we will take 900 as the base number.

945 = 900 + 45 (so 945 is 45 more than 900) so we take it as +45 (note 1)

936 = 900 + 36 (so 936 is 36 more than 900) so we take it as +36 (note 2)

So here the base number is 900 as we are comparing both the numbers with it.

Step 1 is to add note 1 + note 2 + base number which will be as below

45 + 36 + 900 = 981

Step 2 is to multiply the outcome of step 1 with the base number 900.

that is we will multiply 981 with 900

981 * 900 = 882900

Step 3 is to multiply note 1 and note 2 and add to the outcome of step 2

45 * 36 = 1620 + 882900 = 884520 (this is your quick answer).

Example 4: Suppose you want to multiply large numbers 889 and 892.

Both these numbers are quite close to the round number 900. So here we will take 900 as the base number.

889 = 900 - 11 (so 889 is 11 less than 900) so we take it as -11 (note 1)

892 = 900 - 8 (so 892 is 8 less than 900) so we take it as -8 (note 2)

So here the base number is 900 as we are comparing both the numbers with it.

Step 1 is to add note 1 + note 2 + base number which will be as below

-11 + (-8) + 900 = 881

Step 2 is to multiply the outcome of step 1 with the base number 900.

that is we will multiply 881 with 900

881 * 900 = 792900

Step 3 is to multiply note 1 and note 2 and add to the outcome of step 2

-11 * (-8) = 88 + 792900 = 792988 (this is your quick answer).

Plz note: this Vedic math trick or method is applicable to multiplying any two numbers whether big or small. But best is to use it when the numbers to be multiplied are close to a round number as mentioned in examples above. Hope it helps.

What short-trick to use to multiply a 3-digit no. and a 2-digit number?

You may also be interested in

How to multiply two 2-digit numbers within seconds using a math trick in mind?

How to find any percentage of any number quickly using a math trick?

Why you don't need to learn tables other than tables of 2 to 10?

Do you find it difficult to learn the tables?

How to multiply 5432 with 3124 in short time using a math trick?

How to multiply 432 with 354 in short time using a math trick?

How to multiply using a short-cut trick if one of the numbers is 5 or 25 or 125?

What is the best short-cut trick to find the square of any number?

How to find the square of 245 and other 3-digit numbers from short trick?

Written by: Rajesh Bihani ( Find me on Google+ )

Disclaimer: The suggestions in the article(wherever applicable) are for informational purposes only. They are not intended as medical or any other type of advice